AR SR22 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting The Teaching Of Geography In Our Schools.
Title
Supporting The Teaching Of Geography In Our Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR22 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SR22.pdf |