AR SR2 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Commending Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority For Its Service Work And Contributions To Its Communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority For Its Service Work And Contributions To Its Communities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-27 Senate Sine Die adjournment
2011-03-09 Senate Read the third time and adopted.
2011-03-03 Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-03-03 Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2011-01-13 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2011-01-13 Senate Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback