AR SR1 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Title
Authorizing The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed |