AR SR1 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts On Being Ranked Number Ten (10) In The Country By The Daily Beast In Its 2014 Survey Of “america’s Top High Schools”.
Title
To Congratulate The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts On Being Ranked Number Ten (10) In The Country By The Daily Beast In Its 2014 Survey Of “america’s Top High Schools”.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR1 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SR1.pdf |