AR SR1 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Honor The United States Marshals And Their Role In Arkansas History And To Support The United States Marshals Museum In Fort Smith, Arkansas.
Title
To Honor The United States Marshals And Their Role In Arkansas History And To Support The United States Marshals Museum In Fort Smith, Arkansas.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-01-18 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-18 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-18 | Senate Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-12 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-01-12 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR1 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SR1.pdf |