AR SJR3 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Allow The Governor To Retain His Or Her Powers And Duties When Absent From The State.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Allow The Governor To Retain His Or Her Powers And Duties When Absent From The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2015-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |