AR SJR15 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

The Arkansas Term Limits Amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Arkansas Term Limits Amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateReviewed by the Governor
2019-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-02SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-01SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as concurred in as amended.
2019-04-01HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2019-04-01HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2019-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2019-03-18SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18SenateAmendment #1 Withdrawn
2019-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback