AR SJR10 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reviewed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reviewed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Extraordinary Sessions Of The General Assembly.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Extraordinary Sessions Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reviewed by the Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |