AR SCR5 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Celebrate And Recognize World Down Syndrome Day In The State Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Celebrate And Recognize World Down Syndrome Day In The State Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned From the House as concurred in.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-19SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback