AR SCR4 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Designate May 2019 As Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Designate May 2019 As Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateReviewed by the Governor
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-12SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback