AR SCR4 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Direct Certain Committees To Conduct An Interim Study To Evaluate The Current Procedure For Natural Gas Royalty Payments And To Research Potential Changes To Improve Accounting Procedures.
Title
To Direct Certain Committees To Conduct An Interim Study To Evaluate The Current Procedure For Natural Gas Royalty Payments And To Research Potential Changes To Improve Accounting Procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2013-03-25 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SCR4 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SCR4.pdf |