AR SCR4 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Include Felony Sex Offenses In The Number Of Felonies For Which Transfer To Parole Eligibility Is Discretionary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Include Felony Sex Offenses In The Number Of Felonies For Which Transfer To Parole Eligibility Is Discretionary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Senate Sine Die adjournment
2012-03-09 Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2012-03-09 House Returned to the Senate.
2012-03-09 House Died in House committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2012-03-01 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2012-03-01 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2012-03-01 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2012-02-23 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2012-02-23 House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2012-02-23 Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
2012-02-23 Senate Read the third time and adopted.
2012-02-13 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2012-02-13 Senate Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback