AR SCR3 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reviewed and approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reviewed and approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Title
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reviewed and approved by the Governor |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2021-01-25 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2021-01-25 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-01-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed |