AR SCR3 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Recognize The Contributions Made By Nolan Richardson Jr. To The University Of Arkansas And To Request The University Of Arkansas At Fayetteville Name The Basketball Court In Bud Walton Arena In His Honor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Recognize The Contributions Made By Nolan Richardson Jr. To The University Of Arkansas And To Request The University Of Arkansas At Fayetteville Name The Basketball Court In Bud Walton Arena In His Honor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateReviewed by the Governor
2019-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateReturned From the House as concurred in.
2019-04-10HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2019-04-10HouseRead the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2019-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-05SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-06SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback