AR SCR3 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Senate Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commending The Successful Elimination Of The Chemical Weapons Stockpile At The Pine Bluff Arsenal.
Title
Commending The Successful Elimination Of The Chemical Weapons Stockpile At The Pine Bluff Arsenal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Senate Approved by Governor | |
2011-02-21 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-02-17 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Returned From the House as concurred in. | |
2011-02-17 | House Returned To Senate concurred in. | |
2011-02-17 | House Resolution received unanimous support. | |
2011-02-17 | House Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate | |
2011-02-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-08 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Aging, Children and Youth, Legislative & Military Affairs | |
2011-02-08 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SCR3 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SCR3.pdf |