AR SCR2 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Commending Guatemala For Relocating The Guatemalan Embassy In Israel To Jerusalem.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Guatemala For Relocating The Guatemalan Embassy In Israel To Jerusalem.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-02-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-18SenateReturned From the House as concurred in.
2019-02-18HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-06SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-02-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-29SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-01-29SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback