AR SCR1 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-01-29SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-01-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-01-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-01-28HouseReturned To Senate concurred in.
2019-01-28HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-01-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-01-22SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-01-22SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-01-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to SENATE RULES, RESOLUTIONS & MEMORIALS
2019-01-10SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback