AR SCR1 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Senate Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Senate Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Title
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Senate Approved by Governor | |
2012-02-23 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Returned From the House as concurred in. | |
2012-02-23 | House Returned To Senate concurred in. | |
2012-02-23 | House Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-22 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2012-02-22 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Prefiled |