AR SB97 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Notification that SB97 is now Act 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas State Game And Fish Commission Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateNotification that SB97 is now Act 83
2016-04-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2016-04-26SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2016-04-21SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2016-04-21SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2016-04-21HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2016-04-21HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-21HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-04-21HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-04-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2016-04-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2016-04-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2016-04-20SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-04-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2016-04-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2016-03-21SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback