AR SB86 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act; And To Amend The Definition Of "athlete" Within The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act; And To Amend The Definition Of "athlete" Within The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Trent Garner [R] | Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] |
Rep. Danny Watson [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |