AR SB86 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish And Require Continuing Education For Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, And Refrigeration Licensees.
Title
To Establish And Require Continuing Education For Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, And Refrigeration Licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Filed |