AR SB86 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB86 is now Act 1394
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Public Defender Commission Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Public Defender Commission Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB86 is now Act 1394
2013-04-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-17SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-16SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-16SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-16HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2013-04-16HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-16HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-04-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-09SenateHeld in Chamber
2013-04-09SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-09SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-09SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-08SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-01-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-01-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback