AR SB85 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB85 is now Act 985
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Service Of A Petition To Terminate Parental Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Service Of A Petition To Terminate Parental Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB85 is now Act 985
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-09SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-02HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-12HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-12SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-11SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-11SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-11SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback