AR SB849 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Senate Notification that SB849 is now Act 867
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Senate Notification that SB849 is now Act 867
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning The Assessment Of Mineral Interests.
Title
An Act Concerning The Assessment Of Mineral Interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Senate Notification that SB849 is now Act 867 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-25 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE | |
2011-03-21 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-09 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |