AR SB846 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB846 is now Act 1156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB846 is now Act 1156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That Persons With Developmental Disabilities Have Equal Access To Medicaid Personal Care Services In Designated Residential Settings.
Title
To Provide That Persons With Developmental Disabilities Have Equal Access To Medicaid Personal Care Services In Designated Residential Settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Senate Notification that SB846 is now Act 1156 | |
2011-04-01 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned From the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-30 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-23 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-23 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-21 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |