AR SB823 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Notification that SB823 is now Act 803
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Notification that SB823 is now Act 803
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Promote The Conservation Of Energy And Natural Resources In Buildings Owned By Public Agencies And Institutions Of Higher Education.
Title
To Promote The Conservation Of Energy And Natural Resources In Buildings Owned By Public Agencies And Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate Notification that SB823 is now Act 803 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-24 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-23 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT | |
2011-03-23 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Committee on Energy | |
2011-03-16 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Re-reffered to Committee on Joint Energy | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |