AR SB81 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Notification that SB81 is now Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Agriculture Department Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Agriculture Department Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09SenateNotification that SB81 is now Act 234
2016-05-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2016-05-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2016-05-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2016-05-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2016-05-05HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2016-05-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-05HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-05-05HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-05-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2016-05-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2016-05-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2016-05-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2016-05-04SenateORDERED ENGROSSED
2016-05-04SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-04SenateRules suspended.
2016-05-04SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted.
2016-05-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2016-05-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2016-04-28SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2016-04-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2016-04-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2016-04-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2016-04-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2016-03-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback