AR SB8 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB8 is now Act 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit A Registered Sex Offender From Recording A Person Under Fourteen (14) Years Of Age In Certain Circumstances; And To Prohibit The Unlawful Use Of A Recording Of A Person Under Fourteen (14) Years Of Age Online.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit A Registered Sex Offender From Recording A Person Under Fourteen (14) Years Of Age In Certain Circumstances; And To Prohibit The Unlawful Use Of A Recording Of A Person Under Fourteen (14) Years Of Age Online.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 60 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateNotification that SB8 is now Act 621
2019-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-27SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-27HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-30SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-30SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-30SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-01-30SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2018-12-10SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback