AR SB778 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB778 is now Act 906
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB778 is now Act 906
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Opportunities For Hearings Before The Oil And Gas Commission; And To Provide The Oil And Gas Commission With Flexibility Regarding The Holding Of Hearings.
Title
To Provide Opportunities For Hearings Before The Oil And Gas Commission; And To Provide The Oil And Gas Commission With Flexibility Regarding The Holding Of Hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notification that SB778 is now Act 906 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-03-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed |