AR SB763 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Notification that SB763 is now Act 822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Notification that SB763 is now Act 822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Restore Certain Rights To A Nonprofit Organization.
Title
To Restore Certain Rights To A Nonprofit Organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notification that SB763 is now Act 822 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |