AR SB76 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Notification that SB76 is now Act 68
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Notification that SB76 is now Act 68
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish An Excursion Train Permit; And To Authorize An Excursion Train Permit Holder To Sell And Serve Alcoholic Beverages.
Title
To Establish An Excursion Train Permit; And To Authorize An Excursion Train Permit Holder To Sell And Serve Alcoholic Beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Notification that SB76 is now Act 68 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-01-28 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-01-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |