AR SB755 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB755 is now Act 1410
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB755 is now Act 1410
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Training Requirements For Compensated In-home Caregivers.
Title
To Establish Training Requirements For Compensated In-home Caregivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - The vote by which SB755 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - The vote by which SB755 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB755 is now Act 1410 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 and 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 and 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-11 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-11 | House | The vote by which SB755 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2013-04-11 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-09 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Receded from Amendment No. 2 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Recalled from engrossing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendment # 2 and 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 and 3 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |