AR SB74 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-02 - Notification that SB74 is now Act 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Office Of The Governor - Legislative Liaisons, Clerk, Assistant Clerk, Senior Administrative Assistant, Receptionist And Administrative Assistant Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Office Of The Governor - Legislative Liaisons, Clerk, Assistant Clerk, Senior Administrative Assistant, Receptionist And Administrative Assistant Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-02SenateNotification that SB74 is now Act 19
2015-01-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-01-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-01-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-01-27SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-01-27HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-01-27HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2015-01-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-01-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-01-26SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2015-01-20SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback