AR SB74 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Notification that SB74 is now Act 173
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Notification that SB74 is now Act 173
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modernize References To The National And State Academy Of Nutrition And Dietetics.
Title
An Act To Modernize References To The National And State Academy Of Nutrition And Dietetics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Notification that SB74 is now Act 173 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Filed |