AR SB717 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that SB717 is now Act 1208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Enhance The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act; And To Create The Combating Prescription Drug Abuse Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Enhance The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act; And To Create The Combating Prescription Drug Abuse Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-08SenateNotification that SB717 is now Act 1208
2015-04-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-31SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-31SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-31SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2015-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-30SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2015-03-30SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-30SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2015-03-30HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-03-30HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-25HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-03-09SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-09SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2015-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback