AR SB710 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Notification that SB710 is now Act 592
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Notification that SB710 is now Act 592
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Arkansas Subsidized Guardianship Act.
Title
Concerning The Arkansas Subsidized Guardianship Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Senate Notification that SB710 is now Act 592 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-18 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-18 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-09 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Filed |