AR SB71 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB71 is now Act 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB71 is now Act 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Procedure For The Appointment Of Members Of The State Highway Commission As Set Out In Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 42.
Title
To Clarify The Procedure For The Appointment Of Members Of The State Highway Commission As Set Out In Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 42.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB71 is now Act 331 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-01-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |