AR SB703 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB703 is now Act 1112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB703 is now Act 1112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Telemedicine Act; To Amend The Definitions Of "professional Relationship" And "telemedicine" Within The Telemedicine Act; And To Allow Telehealth Certification For Medical Marijuana.
Title
To Amend The Telemedicine Act; To Amend The Definitions Of "professional Relationship" And "telemedicine" Within The Telemedicine Act; And To Allow Telehealth Certification For Medical Marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Notification that SB703 is now Act 1112 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The vote by which SB703 Passed was expunged. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB703 failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Filed |