AR SB70 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB70 is now Act 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB70 is now Act 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Supreme Court Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Supreme Court Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB70 is now Act 221 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-26 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2015-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Filed |