AR SB7 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Members Of The General Assembly To Attend Hearings Held Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Title
To Allow Members Of The General Assembly To Attend Hearings Held Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB7 is now Act 329 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-04 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-02-21 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Filed |