AR SB7 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Ethics Violations By Certain Elected Officials; To Prohibit Constitutional Officers From Soliciting Or Accepting Loans From Lobbyists; And To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Article 19, Section 30.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Ethics Violations By Certain Elected Officials; To Prohibit Constitutional Officers From Soliciting Or Accepting Loans From Lobbyists; And To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Article 19, Section 30.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB7 is now Act 1108 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2016-11-18 | Senate | Filed |