AR SB7 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 218
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Notification that SB7 is now Act 218
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
To Abolish The Arkansas Lottery Commission; To Establish The Office Of The Arkansas Lottery Within The Department Of Finance And Administration To Administer The Arkansas Lottery; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Abolish The Arkansas Lottery Commission; To Establish The Office Of The Arkansas Lottery Within The Department Of Finance And Administration To Administer The Arkansas Lottery; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | Notification that SB7 is now Act 218 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-02-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-01-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Filed |