AR SB691 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB691 is now Act 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB691 is now Act 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Identify Paid Advertisements Funded By Taxpayer Funds; And To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Advertising Using The Image Or Voice Of An Elected Official.
Title
To Identify Paid Advertisements Funded By Taxpayer Funds; And To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Advertising Using The Image Or Voice Of An Elected Official.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB691 is now Act 1043 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Filed |