AR SB68 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Southern Arkansas University - Lignite Research Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Southern Arkansas University - Lignite Research Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Senate Sine Die adjournment
2012-02-16 Senate Withdrawn by author.
2012-02-16 Senate Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2012-02-13 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2012-02-08 Senate Prefiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback