AR SB68 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notification that SB68 is now Act 163
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notification that SB68 is now Act 163
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Specify Conditions For Calculating Service Credits Under A Contract Buyout Agreement; To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Specify Conditions For Calculating Service Credits Under A Contract Buyout Agreement; To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate Notification that SB68 is now Act 163 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-02 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2011-02-22 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-18 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs | |
2011-01-18 | Senate Filed |