AR SB673 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB673 is now Act 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB673 is now Act 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Statutory Foreclosure Act Of 1987.
Title
To Amend The Statutory Foreclosure Act Of 1987.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Notification that SB673 is now Act 1108 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Filed |