AR SB664 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB664 is now Act 1088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require That New Inmates Receive Reading Assessments And Dyslexia Screenings; To Require Reading And Dyslexia Services; And To Require Corrections Teachers Know Best Practices Of Science-based Reading Instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require That New Inmates Receive Reading Assessments And Dyslexia Screenings; To Require Reading And Dyslexia Services; And To Require Corrections Teachers Know Best Practices Of Science-based Reading Instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateNotification that SB664 is now Act 1088
2019-04-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-10HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-08HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-08SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-04-02SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-29SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback