AR SB66 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Law Concerning Distracted Driving; And To Make A Violation Of The Distracted Driving Law A Secondary Offense.
Title
To Clarify The Law Concerning Distracted Driving; And To Make A Violation Of The Distracted Driving Law A Secondary Offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB66 |
Text | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB66.pdf |