AR SB66 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Notification that SB66 is now Act 84
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Real Estate Commission Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Real Estate Commission Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25SenateNotification that SB66 is now Act 84
2014-02-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2014-02-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2014-02-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2014-02-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2014-02-19HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2014-02-19HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-02-19HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-19HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2014-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2014-02-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2014-02-18SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2014-02-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-02-18SenateRules suspended.
2014-02-18SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2014-02-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2014-02-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback