AR SB644 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB644 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB644 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer - The Arkansas Sports Hall Of Fame General Improvement Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer - The Arkansas Sports Hall Of Fame General Improvement Appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Salmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Notification that SB644 is now Act 528 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned To Senate as Passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-03-17 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2011-03-15 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Filed |